open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-40460
    Party Name:Jeanette Painter
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?342484
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =