open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-10624
    Party Name:Nikitoe J. Lester and Eddie M. Lester
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?342476
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =