open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-70588
    Party Name:Lisa Jones
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:July 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:July 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Avoid Lien for Non-PMSI Pursuant to 522(f)(1)(B)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Joy R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held - Trustee's Motion to Dismiss - WD]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?342480
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =