open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:18-51047
    Party Name:Sandra Elaine Webb
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Default on Motion (Dismiss)]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held-Motion to Dismiss-CD]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Modify Plan After Confirmation]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Approve Agreement]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held and Continued to Final Disposition Calendar]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Approval of Agreement]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmable AEC]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmable JDW]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:June 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelley, - Ch 7 Walter W. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?342492
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =