open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-70564
    Party Name:Mary Joiner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to File Form 423 - Supplemental Notice Ch 13 Only]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Default on Motion (Other)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held and Continued to Final Disposition Calendar]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Continued Relief From Stay and/or Co Debtor Stay With Order]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?342346
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =