open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:16-40744-
    Party Name:Alice M. Mitchell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Dismissing Case (Trustee's Motion to Dismiss)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Relief from Stay (Order)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Continuing Hearing to:]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Consent Order]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Motion to Make Direct Payments to Trustee (order)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Meredith, O Byron [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?340185
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =