open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-71216
    Party Name:Rufus S. Curtis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmed (Terminate Hearings)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Allow Late Claim]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?339833
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =