open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:15-07014
    Party Name:Georgia Department of Human Services v. Morris
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 7 Chapter: Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 7 Chapter: Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 7 Chapter: Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Order on Complaint]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 7 Chapter: [Hearing Set on Complaint]
    Date Published:May 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 7 Chapter: Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?340982
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =