open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:15-71204
    Party Name:Anthony L. Reaves
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to File Form 423 - Supplemental Notice Ch 13 Only]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmed (Terminate Hearings)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:January 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Default on Motion (Dismiss)]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Modify Plan After Confirmation]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?336682
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =