U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00048-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JONES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • July 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2015
  • May 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.