U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROBINSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
May, 2015
  • May 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.