U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2015
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
May, 2015
  • May 14, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.