U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00021-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCLAIN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Postpone]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
  • June 04, 2020: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
  • August 05, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Surrender]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 08, 2016: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • June 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 10, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 30, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 22, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 15, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 06, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Order]
May, 2015
  • May 15, 2015: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.