U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:07-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DAVIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
May, 2015
  • May 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.