U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. VICKERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2015
  • May 21, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.