U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:13-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WHITE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2015
  • May 27, 2015: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.