U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KENDRICK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • March 21, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.