U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TRIANA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Acquittal]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • August 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • August 03, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2015
  • June 11, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.