U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 17, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.