U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2015
  • August 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.