U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MATTINGLY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order of Detention]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 30, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.