U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Starks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order of Detention]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence i/c/w Fair Sentencing Act of 2010]
  • July 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.