U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MUCKLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.