U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order to Surrender]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.