U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FLAKES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.