U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LEFTWICH et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 06, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 05, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.