U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SUDDETH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • August 07, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 07, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.