U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:12-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARDY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment or Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.