U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:88-cr-00003-5
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SMITH et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Order Reducing Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.