U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCOLLUM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2016: [(TRMD) CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 07, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 06, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for 404(b) Material Re: Prior Bad Acts]
  • January 13, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 17, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 11, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.