U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:12-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LAWRENCE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.