U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LATIMORE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order of Detention]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • June 01, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.