U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GOODWIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.