U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00042-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GOINS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 21, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 21, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.