U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:08-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.