U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FOSTER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.