U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LOWDER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence i/c/w Fair Sentencing Act of 2010]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Amended Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.