U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. STILLWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.