U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JEFFRIES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.