U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Amended Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 17, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.