U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SISTRUNK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Order to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.