U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:15-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FRANKLIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 16, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.