U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PARRISH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 24, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.