U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HERNANDEZ-ROSILES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 05, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 24, 2015: [Interpreter Appointed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.