U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00037-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MORRISSETTE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Order of Detention]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.