U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00016-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TARPKINS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Reducing Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.