U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GUTIERREZ et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.