U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PARRISH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.