U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MAXWELL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • November 01, 2017: [Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • August 01, 2017: [Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • May 03, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • April 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • March 01, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 18, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 05, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Oral Order]
  • December 31, 2015: [Order]
  • December 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 10, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 04, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 03, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 20, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 14, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 09, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.