U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KENDRICK et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 02, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order]
  • October 06, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.